FL S1512 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that certain premiums charged to state agencies for coverage by the State Risk Management Trust Fund use a retrospective rating arrangement based upon actual losses accruing to the fund and loss prevention results. Requires that the Division of Risk Management of the Department of Financial Services evaluate each agency's risk management programs at specified intervals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Risk Management Programs [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/26/10, 10:45 am, 412-K --Amendment adopted-Temporarily postponed
2010-03-22 Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00308; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/25/10, 1:30 pm, 412-K --Pending reconsideration (Favorable; YEAS 22 NAYS 0)
2010-03-19 CS by General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00280; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00292; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-16 On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 03/19/10, 8:30 am, 401-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00107
2010-02-03 Referred to General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2010-01-27 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H5603 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
028401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
028436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
028450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback