FL H4781 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 2431A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 2431A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Spring Lake/Sebring Airport Area Fire Rescue Station.
Title
Spring Lake/Sebring Airport Area Fire Rescue Station
Sponsors
Rep. Kaylee Tuck [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 2431A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-12-16 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Filed |