FL H4777 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for The Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr. Regional Public Safety Training Center.
Title
The Deputy William J. Gentry, Jr. Regional Public Safety Training Center
Sponsors
Rep. Kaylee Tuck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-16 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4777 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4777/BillText/Filed/PDF |