FL H4441 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Davie Fire Rescue Ladder Truck.
Title
Davie Fire Rescue Ladder Truck
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Meeting Cancelled |
2019-12-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-21 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4441 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4441/BillText/Filed/PDF |