FL H4395 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Institute of Technology: Center for Advanced Manufacturing and Innovative Design (CAMID): Phase II - Major Capital Equipment.
Title
Florida Institute of Technology: Center for Advanced Manufacturing and Innovative Design (CAMID): Phase II - Major Capital Equipment
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 1:00 pm, 216 Capitol |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4395 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4395/BillText/Filed/PDF |