FL H4389 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 3229B)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 3229B)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Santa Rosa County Judicial Center Master Site Planning.
Title
Santa Rosa County Judicial Center Master Site Planning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 3229B) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-17 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4389 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4389/BillText/Filed/PDF |