FL H4273 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1239A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1239A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Vero Beach Police Firearms Range.
Title
Vero Beach Police Firearms Range
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1239A) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1239A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4273 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4273/BillText/Filed/PDF |