FL H4159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Pace Center for Girls, Hernando County.
Title
Pace Center for Girls, Hernando County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4159 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4159/BillText/Filed/PDF |