FL H4137 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to compensation of marshal.
Title
Marshal of the Supreme Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#63 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-25 | In Messages | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time -HJ 292 | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/11 | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 260 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/17/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 137 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/08/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 137 | |
2011-02-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0962 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1398 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1398 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration