FL H4095 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the City of Opa-locka - Gymnasium.
Title
City of Opa-locka - Gymnasium
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-30 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4095 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4095/BillText/Filed/PDF |