FL H4035 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of sales & use tax exemption for industrial machinery & equipment purchased by certain manufacturing businesses.
Title
Industrial Machinery & Equipment Sales Tax Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1044 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H0597 (Similar To) 2015-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0597 (Similar To) 2015-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4035 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4035/BillText/Filed/PDF |