FL S1044 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the scheduled repeal of the sales and use tax exemption for industrial machinery and equipment purchased by certain manufacturing businesses, etc.
Title
Industrial Machinery and Equipment Sales Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4035 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
H0597 (Similar To) 2015-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0597 (Similar To) 2015-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1044 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1044/BillText/Filed/HTML |