FL H3621 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 517)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 517)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Miami Project to Cure Paralysis - Spinal Cord and Traumatic Brain.
Title
Miami Project to Cure Paralysis - Spinal Cord and Traumatic Brain
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 517) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3621 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3621/BillText/Filed/PDF |