FL H3557 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for appropriation to compensate Maricelly Lopez, individually & as personal representative of Estate of Omar Mieles, for wrongful death of her son, Omar Mieles, which was due to negligence of police officer of City of North Miami; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs; provides that appropriation settles all present & future claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Maricelly Lopez/City of North Miami

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#298 (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-219
2015-06-11 Approved by Governor
2015-06-01 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-28HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-28SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2015-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 78
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-27SenateWithdrawn from Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 9
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-10HouseReferred to- Calendar
2015-04-10HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee
2015-04-09HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-04-09HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-07HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/07/15, 4:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-10HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-03-09HouseIntroduced
2015-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0078 (Same As) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3557 (Ch. 2015-219)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback