FL S0078 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3557 (Ch. 2015-219)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Maricelly Lopez by the City of North Miami; providing for an appropriation to compensate Maricelly Lopez, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Omar Mieles, for the wrongful death of her son, Omar Mieles, which was due to the negligence of a police officer of the City of North Miami; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs; providing that the appropriation settles all present and future claims related to the death of Omar Mieles, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Maricelly Lopez by the City of North Miami

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3557 (Ch. 2015-219)
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted CS/HB 3557
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-20SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-15SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-04-14SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-04-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-04-02SenateNow in Community Affairs
2015-04-01SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2015-04-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-31SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/31/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-27SenateNow in Judiciary
2015-03-27SenateRecommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2014-12-03SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2014-07-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H3557 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-219

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback