FL H3517 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides appropriation from General Revenue Fund to compensate parents for loss of their son, Devaughn Darling, whose death occurred while he was engaged in football preseason training on Florida State University campus; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Dennis Darling, Sr., & Wendy Smith/State of Florida

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-18HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2015-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0038 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback