FL H3365 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Children's Initiative Education Support.
Title
Florida Children's Initiative Education Support
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-10 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |