FL H3009 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Bristol Water System Improvements.
Title
Bristol Water System Improvements
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-09 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/3009 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/3009/BillText/Filed/PDF |