FL H2887 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 515)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 515)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Johns Hopkins All Children's Hospital Academic Orthodontic Care for Complex Pediatric Patients in the Tampa Bay Area.
Title
Johns Hopkins All Children's Hospital Academic Orthodontic Care for Complex Pediatric Patients in the Tampa Bay Area
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 515) | |
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 515) |
2021-03-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-09 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |