FL H2613 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Alliance for Assistive Services and Technology.
Title
Florida Alliance for Assistive Services and Technology
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Salzman [R] | Rep. David Borrero [R] | Rep. Joseph Casello [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Daisy Morales [D] | Rep. Allison Tant [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 28) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-11-09 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-03 | House | Filed |