FL H2109 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Pathways for Change, Inc. - Addiction Treatment for Incarcerated Males.
Title
Pathways for Change, Inc. - Addiction Treatment for Incarcerated Males
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-01 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2109 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2109/BillText/Filed/PDF |