FL H2101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Town of Lake Park - Downtown Parking Lot.
Title
Town of Lake Park - Downtown Parking Lot
Sponsors
Rep. Al Jacquet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/15/17, 8:30 am, 116 Knott Building |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2101 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2101/BillText/Filed/PDF |