FL H2091 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Electric Vehicle Charging Stations - Mount Dora.
Title
Electric Vehicle Charging Stations - Mount Dora
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-24 | House | Referred to Infrastructure and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2091 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2091/BillText/Filed/PDF |