FL H2053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Ocala Lower Floridan Aquifer Conversion (Phase I).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ocala Lower Floridan Aquifer Conversion (Phase I)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-02-13HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback