FL H2011 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida IATSE Joint Classification & Training Committee Training.
Title
Florida IATSE Joint Classification & Training Committee Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Reed Hall |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-08-22 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2011 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2011/BillText/Filed/PDF |