FL H1627 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-271
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-271
Summary
Revises provisions relating to authority's purpose & grant application criteria; corrects cross-references.
Title
Hardee County Economic Development Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Chapter No. 2010-271 | |
2010-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01288 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00950; Read 3rd time -SJ 00950; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00950 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -SJ 00872; Referred to Rules -SJ 00872 | |
2010-04-22 | In Messages | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00910; Read 3rd time -HJ 00910; CS passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00910 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00648; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00648 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00358 | |
2010-03-19 | CS read 1st time on 03/19/10 -HJ 00351; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00353 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/17/10, 9:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00267 | |
2010-03-08 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00223 |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1627&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |