FL H1591 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants services to be billed under supervising physician's Medicaid provider under certain circumstances.
Title
Medicaid Billing for Behavioral Health Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-02-01 | House | Removed from Meeting Agenda of Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-31 | House | Added to Select Committee on Health Innovation agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1358 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1591 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1591/BillText/Filed/PDF |