FL H1571 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Chapter No. 2022-118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Chapter No. 2022-118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from picketing or protesting before or about dwelling of person with specified intent; requires specified warning before arrest.
Title
Residential Picketing
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Randy Maggard [R] | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] |
Rep. Spencer Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#658 (Y: 76 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#658 (Y: 76 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Chapter No. 2022-118 | |
2022-05-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-07 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 28 NAYS 3 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1664 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 76, NAYS 41 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 310405 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 320603 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 598833 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 839185 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1664 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1571