FL S1664 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from picketing or protesting before or about the dwelling of a person with specified intent; providing criminal penalties; requiring a specified warning before arresting a person for a certain violation, etc.
Title
Residential Picketing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1571 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1571 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1571 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Chapter No. 2022-118