FL H1555 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits local governments from requiring notice, application, approval, permit, fee, or mitigation for pruning, trimming, or removal of tree on residential property if property owner possesses certain documentation; provides that tree poses unacceptable risk if removal is only means of practically mitigating its risk below moderate as determined by specified procedures.
Title
Private Property Rights to Prune, Trim, and Remove Trees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 518 |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-27 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S518 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-121