FL H1547 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from public meetings requirements that portion of panel review hearing at which exempt or confidential information of specified inmates being considered for conditional medical release program is discussed; exempts from public records requirements certain records used by review panel to make determination of appropriateness of conditional medical release & recordings & transcripts of closed panel review hearings; provides for legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Meetings and Rec./Conditional Medical Release
Sponsors
Rep. Dianne Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1545 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S248 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S232 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S248 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S232 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1547 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1547/BillText/Filed/PDF |