FL H1545 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires custodial interrogation conducted at place of detention in connection with covered offenses be electronically recorded; revises provisions concerning review of juvenile offender sentences; establishes conditional medical release program; requires DOC to notify persons within specified timeframe of an inmate's diagnosis of terminal medical condition & allow visits; establishes conditional aging inmate release program.
Title
Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Rep. Dianne Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1547 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H1549 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S232 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S246 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S248 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1549 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S232 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S246 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S248 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
900 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 1402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 14021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 1403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 0911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 0912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1545 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1545/BillText/Filed/PDF |