FL H1545 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-16 - Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Pending: House Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Broadband Pole Replacement Trust Fund within DEO; provides purpose of trust fund; provides that moneys credited to trust fund shall consist of certain funds; requires that funds in trust fund be used in manner consistent with federal law; provides that balance in trust fund at end of fiscal year remains in trust fund & is available for carrying out purposes of trust fund; provides for future legislative review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Broadband Pole Replacement Trust Fund/DEO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-16HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1543 (Related) 2022-01-16 - Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S1802 (Same As) 2022-01-19 - On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2889965Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback