FL S1800 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the duties of the Florida Office of Broadband to include administering the Broadband Pole Replacement Program; establishing the Broadband Pole Replacement Program within the office; providing that certain denied applicants may reapply in certain circumstances; requiring the office to provide certain reimbursements within a certain period of time, etc.
Title
Broadband Infrastructure
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Jim Boyd [R] | Sen. Jennifer Bradley [R] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (458996) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/22/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-26 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1802 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
H1543 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H1545 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H1543 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H1545 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 9961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |