FL H1497 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain applicants for medical marijuana treatment center licenses from specified licensure requirements; requires medical marijuana treatment center licenses issued to individuals be changed to reflect name of specified business entities or partnerships; provides death of applicant does not bar estate of such applicant from challenging DOH's decision on application & may not be reason to deny challenge.
Title
Medical Marijuana Treatment Center Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1300 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S1582 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S1582 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1497 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1497/BillText/Filed/PDF |