FL H1489 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for reemployment assistance benefits eligibility; prohibits DEO from denying person reemployment assistance solely on basis of pregnancy; requires alternative base period to be used when calculating wages in determining qualification for reemployment assistance benefits; requires DEO to contact individual's employer if certain wage information is unavailable through specified means; specifies that wages that fall within alternative base period are not available for reuse in subsequent benefit years; revises weekly benefit amounts individual may receive; increases cap on total benefit amount individual is entitled to receive during benefit year; increases duration of benefits.
Title
Reemployment Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1568 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1484 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1484 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1489 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1489/BillText/Filed/PDF |