FL S1484 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the maximum weekly and yearly benefit amounts for reemployment assistance; increasing the duration of such benefits, etc.
Title
Reemployment Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1568 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H1489 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H1489 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
443 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1484 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1484/BillText/Filed/HTML |