FL H1467 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes provisions relating to district school board members' salaries & revises provisions relating to selection of instructional materials & other materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-20 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-21HouseReported out of Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-20HouseFavorable by Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-18HouseAdded to Education & Employment Committee agenda
2022-01-16HouseNow in Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1409 (Similar To) 2022-01-16 - Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
S1300 (Similar To) 2022-01-25 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100629Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
14519Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback