FL H1409 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain public schools that provide information or offer programs to students relating to human sexuality to provide information or offer programs that meet specified criteria; requires public schools to make certain curriculum available to parents & guardians upon request; authorizes students to be excused from certain portions of program without penalty; provides compliance review process.
Title
Education in Public Schools Concerning Human Sexuality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1936 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
H1467 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-21
S1300 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
H1467 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-21
S1300 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1409 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1409/BillText/Filed/PDF |