FL H1467 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces ad valorem millage cap, subject to referendum; specifies that authority is housed within City of Pinellas Park for administrative purposes; increases & revises authority membership; increases term for each member; deletes provisions requiring secretary & treasurer to be elected & treasurer to post surety bond; deletes provision relating to insurance premiums; provides for referendum on millage cap.
Title
Pinellas Park Water Management District Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Finance & Tax Council | |
2010-04-12 | Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00662 | |
2010-04-09 | CS read 1st time on 04/09/10 -HJ 00654; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-04-08 | CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 00655 | |
2010-04-06 | On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 04/08/10, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00257 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00132 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2760 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died, not introduced