FL H1445 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 256 (Ch. 2023-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 256 (Ch. 2023-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to employee organizations including organizations for public employees; forms; dues & uniform assessments; financial reports & notifications to members; prohibitions; & applications for initial registration, renewal of registration, recertification & revocation of registration, & certification.
Title
Employee Organizations Representing Public Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 256 (Ch. 2023-35) |
2023-04-25 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 256 |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023) |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-12 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S256 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Chapter No. 2023-35
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 2315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |