FL H1427 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides exemption for certain providers from participation in community-based managing entity that provides behavioral health services.
Title
Behavioral Health Services
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Rep. Chris Dorworth [R] | Sen. Alan Hays [R] | Rep. William Proctor [R] |
Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health Care Services Policy (HFPC) | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00256 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00127 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2002 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs