FL H1417 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises instructional hours required in Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program to provide for 8-hour program day in summer & school-year programs.
Title
Instructional Hours for the Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1922 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1417 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1417/BillText/Filed/PDF |