FL H1387 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1714 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1714 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires funds from sale of surplus state-owned buildings & associated nonconservation lands to be deposited in Architects Incidental Trust Fund & used for specified purposes; removes requirement that surplus state-owned buildings & lands be offered for lease or sale to state universities & Florida College System institutions before being offered to state agencies; provides requirement for determining value of surplus lands.
Title
Sale of Surplus State-owned Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1714 passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/18/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-20
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 0341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1387 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1387/BillText/Filed/PDF |