FL H1363 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1304
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1304
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes official records of certain proceedings when family trust company, licensed family trust company, or foreign licensed family trust company is party confidential & exempt from public record requirements; provides exceptions.
Title
Pub. Rec./Trust Proceedings
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee | Rep. Elizabeth Fetterhoff [R] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
Rep. Mike Beltran [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1304 |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-22 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-04 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-02 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1304 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Ordered enrolled
H1229 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1229 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction