FL H1351 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a special zone; provides boundaries; provides exception to general law; provides space, seating, & minimum gross revenue requirements for special alcoholic beverage licenses for certain restaurants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of St. Cloud, Osceola County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#116 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Chapter No. 2019-182
2019-06-04 Approved by Governor
2019-05-23 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-17SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-10HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-09HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-08HouseCS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback