FL H1343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for state agencies & local governments to receive or solicit proposals to enter into public works infrastructure project agreements with private entity, or consortium of private entities, to build, operate, or finance public works infrastructure project; provides criteria for selection of project & private entity; requires all reasonable costs to state related to project to be borne by private entity, etc.
Title
Public-Private Partnership Infrastructure Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00255 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00121 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2444 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability