FL S2444 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for state agencies and local governments to receive or solicit proposals to enter into a public works infrastructure project agreement with a private entity, or a consortium of private entities, to build, operate, or finance a public works infrastructure project. Authorizes the private entity to impose user fees for the use of the infrastructure project by the public, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public-private Partnership Infrastructure Projects [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00210
2010-03-04 Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00210
2010-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1343 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
028709475Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback