FL H1339 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Florida Business & Workforce Competitiveness Trust Fund; Requires trust fund moneys be provided to local workforce development boards to award & administer certain grants; specifies duties of CareerSource Florida, Inc.; creates trust fund requirements, eligibility, & limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Florida Business and Workforce Competitiveness Trust Fund/DEO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1337 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
S640 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S638 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
445015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback