FL S0640 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Business and Workforce Competitiveness Trust Fund within the State Treasury, to be administered by the Department of Economic Opportunity; requiring trust fund moneys to be provided to local workforce development boards to award and administer certain grants; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.
Title
Trust Funds/Florida Business and Workforce Competitiveness Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S638 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H1339 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
H1337 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
H1339 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
H1337 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/640 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/640/BillText/Filed/HTML |